Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013149930 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213686170 | 27.11.2012 | US201161569365 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015505757 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69208 | 12.12.2012 | US201161569365 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103987895 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69208 | 12.12.2012 | US201161569365 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2791414 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US69208 | 12.12.2012 | US201161569365 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013090406 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161569365 | 12.12.2011 |