EP2802287 - ARANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A STENT FOR IMPLANTATION USING A COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qvanteq AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states Qvanteq AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCKER, Arik Saumstrasse 51 CH-8003 Zürich / CH | 02 /
BUZZI, Stefano Vorhaldenstrasse 17 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 03 /
MÄDER, Armin, W. Säntisstrasse 23 CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | 04 /
SCHNEEBERGER, Roman Zelglistrasse 5 CH-4805 Brittnau / CH | 05 /
MILLERET, Vincent Zürichholzstrasse 8 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/47] | BOVARD AG Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 12810270.4 | 20.12.2012 | [2019/26] | WO2012EP76406 | Priority number, date | CH20120004812 | 11.01.2012 Original published format: CH 48122012 | [2014/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013104509 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802287 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802287 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/95, A61F2/958, A61F2/00 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/0095 (EP,US);
B08B3/04 (US);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | A61F2/00, A61F2/958 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES STENTS ZUR IMPLANTATION MIT UMHÜLLUNG | [2014/47] | English: | ARANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A STENT FOR IMPLANTATION USING A COVER | [2014/47] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRÉPARER UN STENT À IMPLANTER, AU MOYEN D'UNE ENVELOPPE | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 25.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2018 | 17.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 02.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | AT | 20.12.2019 | LU | 20.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0121103 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10,15-17,21-23,26-28 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 10; figure 9 * [A] 12; | [X]US2005278012 (VONDERWALDE CARLOS [CA]) [X] 29-31 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure - *; | [X]US2006230592 (HEANEY BARRY [IE], et al) [X] 1,8-10,15-18,21-23,26-28 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0055]; figure - *; | [I]US2007061008 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al) [I] 29-31* paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066]; figure - *; | [XI]US2009143857 (MELSHEIMER JEFFRY S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,15-17,19,20,24,26-28 * paragraphs [0068] - [0071] - [0075]; figure - * [I] 5-9,11-14,18,25,29-31 | Examination | US2006093513 | US2007014686 | by applicant | EP0910425 | US2003187493 | WO2004066876 | US6968607 | WO2006086709 | US2006183383 | US2008072653 | - SOEHNLEIN ET AL., "Neutrophil-Derived Cathelicidin Protects from Neointimal Hyperplasia", SCI TRANSL MED, (2011), page 3 | CH20120000049 |