EP2929751 - A WIRELESS DEVICE, A RADIO NETWORK NODE AND METHODS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/44] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Qianxi Nanhuxiyuan 226 Room 2-101 Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
MIAO, Qingyu Room 2-302 Building 611 Bei Yuan Jia Yuan Moli Yuan, Chaoyang district Beijing 100012 / CN | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 12810441.1 | 10.12.2012 | [2015/42] | WO2012SE51370 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014092612 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929751 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2929751 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/04, H04W76/02 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/23 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/06 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSVORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKKNOTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM UNREGELMÄSSIGEN EMPFANG IN EINER D2D-KOMMUNIKATION | [2015/42] | English: | A WIRELESS DEVICE, A RADIO NETWORK NODE AND METHODS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS | [2015/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF SANS FIL, NOEUD DE RÉSEAU RADIO ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16190136.8 / EP3136812 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2012 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | IE | 10.12.2016 | LU | 10.12.2016 | MT | 10.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
MT | 10.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
MT | 10.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011237231 (HORNEMAN KARI VEIKKO [FI], et al) [A] 1-38 * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] - [0050] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0093]; figure 4b *; | [A]US2011268004 (DOPPLER KLAUS FRANZ [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0072] ** paragraph [0086]; figure 6 * |