EP2791412 - ENZYMATIC PRE-TREATMENT OF MARKET PULP TO IMPROVE FIBER DRAINAGE AND PHYSICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enzymatic Deinking Technologies, LLC 3975 Steve Reynolds Boulevard Norcross, GA 30093 / US | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAUSCHE, James 5231 Powers Ferry Road NW Atlanta, GA 30327 / US | 02 /
MA, Jianhua 5690 Lake Manor Trace Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 03 /
TAUSCHE, Paul 70 Spring Lane West Hartford, Connecticut 06107 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Withers & Rogers Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/43] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12810478.3 | 11.12.2012 | [2023/03] | WO2012US68965 | Priority number, date | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 Original published format: US201113323136 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090272 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791412 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2791412 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21C5/00, D21C5/02, D21H11/14, D21H21/10, D21H21/18 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
D21H21/10 (EP,US);
D21C5/005 (EP,US);
D21C5/02 (EP,US);
D21H11/14 (EP,US);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
D21H17/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE VORBEHANDLUNG EINES MARKT-ZELLSTOFFS ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINER FASERENTWÄSSERUNG UND PHYSIKALISCHER EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2014/43] | English: | ENZYMATIC PRE-TREATMENT OF MARKET PULP TO IMPROVE FIBER DRAINAGE AND PHYSICAL PROPERTIES | [2014/43] | French: | PRÉTRAITEMENT ENZYMATIQUE DE PÂTE COMMERCIALISÉE POUR AMÉLIORER L'ÉGOUTTEMENT DE FIBRES ET LES PROPRIÉTÉS PHYSIQUES DE FIBRES | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Observations by third parties | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2023
19.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE AB Enzymes GmbH Postfach 10 12 39 64212 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2023
19.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE AB Enzymes GmbH Postfach 10 12 39 64212 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2023/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2023
19.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE AB Enzymes GmbH Postfach 10 12 39 64212 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2023/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2023
AB Enzymes GmbH Postfach 10 12 39 64212 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 02.11.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | IT | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | LU | 11.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
IT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5620565 (LAZORISAK NICHOLAS W [US], et al); | [XI]US6066233 (OLSEN WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [X]WO0068500 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [XI]US2006048908 (WANG XIANG [US], et al); | [X]US2011168344 (KLEIN TORSTEN [DE], et al) | Examination | WO03021033 | US2006102299 | WO2011044646 | by applicant | US5110412 | US5507914 | US6066233 | US6635146 | US6808595 | US6939437 | US7067244 | US2007111920 | other | WO03021033 | US2006102299 | WO2011044646 | Opposition | WO03021033 | US2006102299 | US2007074832 |