30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
12.07.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
01.06.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
05.03.2024 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
15.12.2023 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
01.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
20.10.2023 |
Opposition filed |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
16.12.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
14.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.09.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.01.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.03.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2018 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.07.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
24.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
13.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|