Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017328007 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715661272 | 27.07.2017 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10718088 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2017328006 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715661263 | 27.07.2017 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2862248 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | C | CA2862248 | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012352522 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2791412 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | B1 | EP2791412 | 22.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014014332 | 08.02.2022 | B1 | BR112014014332 | 02.03.2021 | A8 | BR112014014332 | 13.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2937662T | 30.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI2791412T | 05.04.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US68965 | 11.12.2012 | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013090272 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9856606 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B2 | US2013146239 | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2014001554 | 26.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2791412T | 06.02.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | US201113323136 | 12.12.2011 |