EP2733423 - METHOD FOR OPERATING PULVERIZED COAL-FIRED BOILER FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADA, Toshiya c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hygo 676-8670 / JP | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12810621.8 | 12.07.2012 | WO2012JP67862 | Priority number, date | JP20110154894 | 13.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011154894 | [2014/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013008893 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2733423 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F23K3/02, F22B1/18, F22B35/00, F22B37/00, F23K3/00, F23L7/00, F23C9/00 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
F23K3/00 (EP,US);
F23K3/02 (KR);
F23D1/005 (US);
F22B1/18 (EP,US);
F22B35/002 (EP,US);
F22B37/008 (EP,US);
F23C9/00 (KR);
F23C9/003 (EP,US);
F23K5/16 (KR);
F23L7/00 (EP,US);
F23C2202/30 (EP,US);
F23C2202/50 (EP,US);
F23J2217/102 (EP,US);
F23J2219/40 (EP,US);
F23K2201/103 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | F23K3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KOHLENSTAUBBEFEUERTEN HEIZKESSELANLAGE | [2014/21] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING PULVERIZED COAL-FIRED BOILER FACILITY | [2014/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EXPLOITER UNE INSTALLATION DE CHAUDIÈRE CHAUFFÉE AU CHARBON PULVÉRISÉ | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2013 | Translation filed | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 03.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0136873 (FORTUM ENGINEERING OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009178332 (IIJIMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0039] - [0056]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2010097999 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]JP2010242999 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028] - [0030]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2011073051 (TANIGUCHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2341229 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2004347241 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2008145007 (IHI CORP); | [Y]JP2010242999 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) | by applicant | JPS62134416 | JPH05272709 | JPH1163471 |