EP2732918 - GRINDING PLATE AND GRINDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2019/24] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDE, Takashi c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
NAKANO, Susumu c/o NSK Ltd. 16-1, Seiran 1-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshiaki c/o NSK Ltd. 16-1, Seiran 1-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga / JP | 04 /
SAKAMOTO, Tubasa c/o NSK Ltd. 16-1, Seiran 1-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga / JP | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2014/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12810806.5 | 22.06.2012 | [2019/24] | WO2012JP66079 | Priority number, date | JP20110153217 | 11.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011153217 | [2014/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013008612 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732918 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732918 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/06, B24B49/02, B24B51/00, B23Q15/24 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B24B51/00 (EP,US);
B24B49/02 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q15/04 (EP,US);
B23Q15/24 (KR);
B24B19/06 (EP,KR,US);
B24B49/03 (EP,US);
B24B49/05 (US);
B24B5/00 (KR);
G05B19/404 (EP,US);
B24B5/37 (US);
B24B5/40 (US);
G05B2219/34389 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | B24B49/02, B23Q15/24, B24B5/00, B24B19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMASCHINE UND SCHLEIFVERFAHREN | [2019/21] | English: | GRINDING PLATE AND GRINDING METHOD | [2014/21] | French: | MACHINE DE MEULAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MEULAGE | [2019/21] |
Former [2014/21] | SCHLEIFPLATTE UND SCHLEIFVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/21] | PLAQUE DE MEULAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MEULAGE | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2014 | Translation filed | 10.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 10.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2012 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | IE | 22.06.2019 | LU | 22.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
LU | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 22.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5562523 (ASANO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 5A * * column 1, lines 7-10 * * column 2, lines 50-55 * * column 3, lines 39-64 * * column 4, lines 9-16 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]EP1839811 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0025] , [0026] , [0027] , [0056] - [0058] * | International search | [A]JPH0329257U (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS, LTD.); | [A]JPH04300160 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2003094303 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2008084130 (JTEKT CORP); | [A]JP2011045940 (KOMATSU NTC LTD) | by applicant | JP2010076005 |