Designated contracting states | AL | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | AT | | BE | | BG | Lapse: 22.11.2018 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | HU | | IE | | IS | Lapse: 22.12.2018 | IT | | LI | | LT | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | LU | | LV | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | MC | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | MK | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | MT | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | RS | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | SE | | SI | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | SK | | SM | Lapse: 22.08.2018 | TR | | Examination procedure | 11.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | European patent granted | 22.08.2018 | Opposition procedure | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 14.05.2014 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 14.05.2014 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20140107 | | Event date: | 15.10.2014 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 43/12 20060101ALI20150310BHEP | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 70/44 20060101ALI20150310BHEP | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED) | Effective DATE: | 20150316 | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 37/10 20060101AFI20150310BHEP | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 35/04 20060101ALN20150310BHEP | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 5/02 20060101ALI20150310BHEP | | Event date: | 23.11.2016 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20161020 | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 37/10 20060101AFI20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 5/02 20060101ALI20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 35/04 20060101ALN20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 11/00 20060101ALN20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 70/44 20060101ALI20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 11.10.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 43/12 20060101ALI20170905BHEP | | Event date: | 18.10.2017 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20170921 | | Event date: | 14.03.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 11/00 20060101ALN20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 70/44 20060101ALI20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 37/10 20060101AFI20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 5/02 20060101ALI20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 43/12 20060101ALI20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 35/04 20060101ALN20180214BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 37/10 20060101AFI20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 43/12 20060101ALI20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 35/04 20060101ALN20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 5/02 20060101ALI20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B30B 11/00 20060101ALN20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 28.03.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B29C 70/44 20060101ALI20180216BHEP | | Event date: | 04.04.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180306 | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 13.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602012050189 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 15.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1031979 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20180915 | | Event date: | 19.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | TR-IP CONSULTING LLC, CH | | Event date: | 11.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 17.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20181210 | | Event date: | 12.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 10.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 28.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181222 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181122 | | Event date: | 05.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2698557 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20190205 | | Event date: | 28.02.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 28.02.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 28.02.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 02.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 29195 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 12.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20180403377 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20190320 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 28.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E041283 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 20.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 602012050189 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | | Event date: | 26.06.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | NFM HOLDING AS | Effective DATE: | 20190520 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 29.11.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 2729305 PT 20181129 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20181121 | | Event date: | 25.12.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | NFM HOLDING AS | Effective DATE: | 20190520 | | Event date: | 14.02.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCAR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: ROUTE DU COUTSET 18, 1485 NUVILLY (CH) | | Event date: | 28.02.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 30.09.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20200710 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20200707 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20200707 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20200707 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200708 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20200706 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20200710 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20200707 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200708 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200709 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20200702 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20200813 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20200716 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20200703 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20200724 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20200715 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20200713 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20200702 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20200802 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20200710 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20200706 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20200706 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 20.07.2018 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 05.03.2018 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 27.02.2018 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 05.02.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 19.01.2018 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 20.09.2017 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 11.04.2014 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 20.07.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 27.02.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 05.02.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Event date: | 20.09.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 01.11.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 21.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 602012050189 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 21.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 602012050189 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Event date: | 22.10.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 15.11.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1031979 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 24.11.2021 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20210421 | | Event date: | 24.11.2021 | | Event description: | GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE | Effective DATE: | 20210421 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 07.12.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MC4A E 29195 SK | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210421 | | Event date: | 03.12.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR NF 20180403377 GR | Code Expl.: | +RESTORATION OF LAPSED RIGHT | Effective DATE: | 20211111 | | Event date: | 23.11.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MGE | Code Expl.: | -REVOKED FOLLOWING OPPOSITION | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MA03 1031979 AT T | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION OF THE PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210421 | | Event date: | 01.03.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE ECNC | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 22.10.2021 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Event date: | 07.07.2021 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 22.11.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 19.10.2019 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 03.06.2019 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 24.05.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 30.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | |