|
17.03.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |