03.07.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.12.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.05.2018 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.02.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
17.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|