EP2791721 - METHODS FOR CREATING A DEMARCATION LOCATION IN A STRUCTURE AND ASSOCIATED ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 4200 Corning Place Charlotte, NC 28216 / US | [2020/02] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISENHOUR, Micah C 1008 Park Circle Lincolnton, North Carolina 28092 / US | 02 /
KNECHT, Dennis M 4921 Elmhurst Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US | 03 /
LUTHER, James P 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 04 /
ROBERTS, Reginald 317 Kent May Lane Taylorsville, North Carolina 28681 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 12813171.1 | 30.11.2012 | WO2012US67181 | Priority number, date | US201161565184P | 30.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161565184 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013082350 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791721 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/3888 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/3628 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/3806 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/3846 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/443 (US);
G02B6/4479 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER MARKIERUNGSSTELLE IN EINER STRUKTUR UND ASSOZIIERTE BAUGRUPPEN | [2014/43] | English: | METHODS FOR CREATING A DEMARCATION LOCATION IN A STRUCTURE AND ASSOCIATED ASSEMBLIES | [2014/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR CRÉER UN EMPLACEMENT DE DÉMARCATION DANS UNE STRUCTURE ET ENSEMBLES ASSOCIÉS | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5469521 (COUTTS BRUCE [US], et al); | [Y]US2002096793 (MARELLI PAOLO [IT], et al); | [X]US2004141708 (YOKOBIKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) |