EP2793866 - BILAYER TABLET COMPRISING BENAZEPRIL HYDROCHLORIDE AND PIMOBENDAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/44] | NEW COMBINATION | ||
[2023/28] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elanco Tiergesundheit AG Mattenstr. 24A 4058 Basel / CH | [2023/43] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Elanco Tiergesundheit AG Mattenstr. 24A 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Novartis Tiergesundheit AG Werk Rosental Schwarzwaldallee 215 WRO-1032 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRMAS, Jernej Lek Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
JERALA-STRUKELJ, Zdenka Lek Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
REVEN, Sebastjan Lek Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2015/48] | Liphardt, Bernd, et al Eli Lilly and Company Ltd European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2014/44] | Liphardt, Bernd Novartis Animal Health, Inc. Patent and Trademark Group Werk Rosenthal 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12813324.6 | 19.12.2012 | [2015/48] | WO2012EP76100 | Priority number, date | EP20110195015 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11195015 | EP20120185714 | 24.09.2012 Original published format: EP 12185714 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013092673 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2793866 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2793866 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2793866 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/4184, A61K31/501, A61K47/12 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
A61K9/5073 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/501, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEISCHICHTTABELLE ENTHALTEND BENAZEPRILHYDROCHLORID UND PIMOBENDAN | [2023/28] | English: | BILAYER TABLET COMPRISING BENAZEPRIL HYDROCHLORIDE AND PIMOBENDAN | [2023/28] | French: | COMPRIMÉ BICOUCHE COMPRENANT DU CHLORHYDRATE DE BÉNAZÉPRIL ET DU PIMOBENDANE | [2023/28] |
Former [2014/44] | NEUE KOMBINATION | ||
Former [2014/44] | NEW COMBINATION | ||
Former [2014/44] | NOUVELLE COMBINAISON | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15193269.6 / EP3034071 | EP17199031.0 / EP3320894 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2016
29.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23 80336 München / DE | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2016
29.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Banse & Steglich, et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2016
29.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 30.09.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.09.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1131/18 | 16.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 19.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 25.11.2015 | AL | 19.12.2019 | CY | 19.12.2019 | FI | 19.12.2019 | HR | 19.12.2019 | LT | 19.12.2019 | LU | 19.12.2019 | LV | 19.12.2019 | MT | 19.12.2019 | RO | 19.12.2019 | RS | 19.12.2019 | SK | 19.12.2019 | SI | 20.12.2019 | EE | 31.12.2019 | IS | 01.01.2020 | MC | 02.01.2020 | BG | 30.06.2020 | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/07] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.12.2019 | ||
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
HR | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
MT | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
RS | 19.12.2019 | ||
SK | 19.12.2019 | ||
SI | 20.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
BG | 30.06.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
HR | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
RS | 19.12.2019 | ||
SK | 19.12.2019 | ||
SI | 20.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
BG | 30.06.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
HR | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
RS | 19.12.2019 | ||
SK | 19.12.2019 | ||
SI | 20.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
BG | 30.06.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
HR | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
RS | 19.12.2019 | ||
SK | 19.12.2019 | ||
SI | 20.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
HR | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
SK | 19.12.2019 | ||
SI | 20.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
LT | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
LV | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
CY | 19.12.2019 | ||
FI | 19.12.2019 | ||
RO | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2017/11] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
Former [2016/49] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
BG | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | SM | 25.11.2015 | |
Former [2016/27] | deleted | ||
Former [2016/25] | LV | 25.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03075895 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]US2005203097 (FOLGER MARTIN A [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010035889 (DAEMMGEN JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010183718 (OVAERT PATRICIA [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2011111066 (CONNEXIOS LIFE SCIENCES PVT LTD [IN], et al); | by applicant | EP1490037 | WO2010055119 | Opposition | US6162802 | JP2005281283 | WO2006085208 | EP1490037 | WO2008095263 | WO2010097501 | WO2011111066 |