EP2794580 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BENZOXAZINONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOCHNAHL, Maximilian Bassermannstr. 35 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
RACK, Michael Hildastr. 11/1 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 03 /
KEIL, Michael Fontanestr.4 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 04 /
WOLF, Bernd Erleweg 3 67150 Niederkirchen / DE | 05 /
VOGELBACHER, Uwe, Josef Rheinecke 22 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
GEBHARDT, Joachim Pegauer Str. 51 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 07 /
FRASSETTO, Timo August-Bebel-Strasse 103 68199 Mannheim / DE | 08 /
MAYWALD, Volker Christoph-Kröwerath-Str. 72 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12813843.5 | 20.12.2012 | WO2012EP76373 | Priority number, date | EP20110195507 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11195507 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013092856 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2794580 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/36, C07D413/04 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C07D265/36 (EP,CN,US);
C07C231/12 (US);
C07D413/04 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BENZOXAZINONEN | [2014/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BENZOXAZINONES | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BENZOXAZINONES | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 12.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]WO2010145992 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 5 * Formulae (I) and (IV); page 11, line 15 - line 20; page 15, line 5 - line 12; page 20, line 10 - line 28 and line 37; page 21, line 4 - line 5 and 12 - line 13;;; example -; claim - * [A] 4,6,7 [Y] 1-3 [I] 8,9; | [YA] - D. A. JOHNSON ET AL, "Nonenzymatic Conversion of Penicillins to 6-Aminopenicillanic Acid", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19660801), vol. 31, no. 8, doi:10.1021/jo01346a027, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2560 - 2564, XP055028090 [Y] 1-3 * Scheme II; experimental section;;; compounds 3a,3d,3e,3f,3g, 4a-4b,5a-5b,6a-6b,7a-7b * [A] 4-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01346a027 | [YA] - HENRI TÉCHER ET AL, "Amides tertiaires de l'acide oxo-3-dihydro-2,3 benzoxazine-1,4 carboxylique-2", COMPTES RENDUS DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, SERIE C: SCIENCES CHIMIQUES, 1970 , VOL. 270, P. 107 - 110, (19700101), vol. 270, pages 107 - 110, XP055026720 [Y] 1-3 * compounds VII, VIII, V * [A] 4-9 | [A] - REANY O ET AL, "A model system using modulation of lanthanide luminescence to signal Znin competitive aqueous media", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (20000901), no. 9, doi:10.1039/B003963M, ISSN 1472-779X, pages 1819 - 1831, XP002220626 [A] 4 * page 1829, column left, paragraph 5; compound 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b003963m | [A] - CAI L ET AL, "Dication C(R<1>)-N(R<2>)2 Synthons and their use in the Synthesis of Formamidines, Amidines, and alpha-Aminonitriles", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20001013), vol. 56, no. 42, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(00)00785-7, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 8253 - 8262, XP004218731 [A] 4 * page 8257; compound 21 * * page 8260, column right, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(00)00785-7 | by applicant | EP0237899 | WO2010145992 | - Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1992), page 1216 FF | - Organikum, WILEY-VCH, (2004), page 626 | - Houben-Weyl, (1985), vol. E11-2, page 1084 |