EP2934556 - COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FROM FISH HATCHING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS FROM FISH HATCHING FLUID | ||
[2018/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aqua Bio Technology ASA Fornebuveien 42-44 1366 Fornebu / NO | [2019/12] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Aqua Bio Technology ASA Thormøhlensgate 55 5008 Bergen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEREN, Hans Kristian Lindhaugsvingen 1a 1366 Høvik / NO | 02 /
FAGOT, Fanny 10027 Pine Forest Rd Houston TX 77042 / US | [2019/12] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
LEREN, Hans Kristian Bjerregårdsgate 7 0172 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
FAGOT, Fanny 10027 Pine Forest Rd Houston TX 77042 / US | |||
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
LEREN, Hans Kristian Nylandsveien 2 N-5039 Bergen / NO | ||
02 /
FAGOT, Fanny Mogens Thorsens Gate 9 N-0264 Olso / NO | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2015/44] | Wilkins, Christopher George Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12813868.2 | 21.12.2012 | [2015/44] | WO2012EP76853 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014094918 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934556 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934556 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/60, A61P17/10, A61P17/06, A61P17/12, A61K8/64, A61K8/98, A61K38/17, A61K38/48, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K35/60 (EP,RU,US);
A61K38/482 (RU,US);
A61K38/1706 (RU,US);
A61K38/4806 (RU,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,RU,US);
A61K8/66 (RU,US);
A61K8/987 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61K35/60, A61P17/10, A61P17/06, A61P17/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS LAICHFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2018/42] | English: | COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FROM FISH HATCHING FLUID | [2018/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES ET PHARMACEUTIQUES À BASE DE FLUIDE D'ÉCLOSION DE POISSON | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/44] | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS LAICHFLÜSSIGKEIT | ||
Former [2015/44] | COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS FROM FISH HATCHING FLUID | ||
Former [2015/44] | COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES À BASE DE FLUIDE D'ÉCLOSION DE POISSON | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2012 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | IE | 21.12.2019 | LU | 21.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9929836 (BOLAKS AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-20* claims 1-10, abstract *; | [I]WO2011064384 (AQUA BIO TECHNOLOGY ASA [NO], et al) [I] 1-20 * figures 2-3; claim 20, pages 27-28 / example 1; page 4, line 7 - 20; page 18, lines 14-16; page 16, lines 1-16 from the bottom; page 21, lines 11-16 * | by applicant | US4268499 | WO2005067499 | US2008038300 | US2009043236 | WO2009085302 | - OPPEN-BERNTSEN ET AL., AQUACULTURE, (1990), vol. 86, pages 417 - 430 | - CTFA International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, THE COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION, INC., (1997), vol. 2, page 1672 |