EP2938231 - A FLUID OUTLET DEVICE FOR A WATER HEATER RECEPTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERZELI, Ismail E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
HASANREISOGLU, Ali Levent E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
GUNDUZ, Nihat E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 04 /
COBAN, Omer Burak E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 12813893.0 | 28.12.2012 | [2015/45] | WO2012EP77098 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101961 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938231 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
A47J27/21166 (EP);
A47J27/21183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | FLUIDAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN WASSERHEIZERBEHÄLTER | [2015/45] | English: | A FLUID OUTLET DEVICE FOR A WATER HEATER RECEPTACLE | [2015/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SORTIE DE FLUIDE POUR UN RÉCEPTACLE DE DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE D'EAU | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 29.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09224834 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE20112265U (CHANG KWEI TANG [TW]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 5, line 19 - line 30 * * page 4, line 5 - line 16 * [Y] 2-8 [I] 9-13; | [Y]EP2456030 (WISKA HOPPMANN & MULSOW GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0009] * * figures 6,8-10 *; | [Y] - Pvc-Profi, "PVC Durchführung 1 1/4 x 1 1/4 Zoll - PVC Rohre | PE Fittings | Pools | Teichzubehör - bei PVC Profi - PVC Rohre | PE Fittings | Pools | Teichzubehör - bei PVC Profi", (20080211), URL: http://www.pvc-profi.de/PVC-Fittings/PVC-Durchfuehrung/PVC-Durchfuehrung-AG/PVC-Durchfuehrung-1-1-4-x-1-1-4-Zoll::2076.html, (20131028), XP055085530 [Y] 2,4-8 * the whole document * |