EP2800525 - RATCHETING FEATURE ON TISSUE STAPLE TRIGGER TO PREVENT PREMATURE JAW OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC 475 Street C Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2016/45] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASUDEVAN, Venkataramanan Mandakolathur 11321 Village Brook Drive Apt. 2228 Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | 02 /
DUNKI-JACOBS, Adam R. 6191 Tulane Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45212 / US | 03 /
BAXTER, Chester O., III 6375 Pawnee Ridge Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Jerome R. 3275 S. Whitetree Circle Cincinnati, Ohio 45236 / US | 05 /
HENDERSON, Cortney E. 191 Hounds Run Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 06 /
MILLER, Christopher C. 433 Pintail Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 07 /
BAKER, Kent P. 6818 Stone Valley Court Liberty Township, Ohio 45011 / US | 08 /
HUNT, John V. 3654 Moorhill Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 09 /
JAMISON, Barry T. 2353 Brickhouse Lane Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 10 /
WEIZMAN, Patrick A. 6528 Michele Lane Liberty Township, Ohio 45044 / US | 11 /
YOUNG, Joseph E. 9523 Carroll Court Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 12 /
KIMBALL, Cory G. 6136 Lagrange Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45239 / US | 13 /
SHURTLEFF, Carl J. 4735 Medallion Way Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 14 /
CHEKAN, Edward G. 424 Oliver Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US | 15 /
FELDER, Kevin D. 2460 Downing Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | 16 /
ALEXANDER, Johnny H., III 7966 Stillmeadow Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 17 /
SWINDON, Patrick J. 3700Pocahontas Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45227 / US | 18 /
SCHOWALTER, Joseph 5490 Little Turtle Drive South Lebanon, Ohio 45065 / US | 19 /
CUMMINGS, John F. 23 Camargo Canyon Drive Madeira, Ohio 45243 / US | 20 /
SERBER, Julia F. 1284 Beacon Street Apt. 408 Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/46] | Application number, filing date | 12814067.0 | 17.12.2012 | [2016/48] | WO2012US69998 | Priority number, date | US201213344093 | 05.01.2012 Original published format: US201213344093 | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013103507 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800525 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800525 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/115 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B17/072 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RATSCHENVORRICHTUNG AN EINEM GEWEBEKLAMMERAUSLÖSER ZUM VERHINDERN VON VORZEITIGER MAULÖFFNUNG | [2014/46] | English: | RATCHETING FEATURE ON TISSUE STAPLE TRIGGER TO PREVENT PREMATURE JAW OPENING | [2014/46] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ENCLIQUETAGE D'APPLICATEUR D'AGRAFES SUR TISSU AFIN D'EMPÊCHER UNE OUVERTURE PRÉMATURÉE DE LA MÂCHOIRE PRÉMATURÉE | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2012 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IS | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | IE | 17.12.2016 | LU | 17.12.2016 | MT | 17.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
MT | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
MT | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0589306 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,6-8,12,15-18 * columns 6-8; figures 3-5; claim 1 *; | [X]US5465895 (KNODEL BRYAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,16,17,20 * column 8, lines 22-67; figures 6,10 *; | [X]EP0760230 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-6,16,17,20 * columns 12-14; figure 2 *; | [XA]WO2008002417 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 16 * figures 3A,3B *[A] 1-15,17-20; | [X]EP2000102 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,16,20 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figures 4-5 *; | [X]US2010094315 (BEARDSLEY JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1,16,20 * paragraphs [0102] - [0103]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2010108213 (ENDOGENE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,7,12-16,20 * pages 7-8; figures 1,2a,2b * |