EP2630010 - SAFETY INTEGRATED SEATING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CVG Management Corporation 7800 Walton Parkway New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIDAR, Raf 91 Leamington Road Styvechale Coventry CV3 6GQ / GB | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12814859.0 | 20.07.2012 | WO2012US47664 | Priority number, date | US201161509605P | 20.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161509605 P | US201161536296P | 19.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161536296 P | US201213554653 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: US201213554653 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013013181 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2630010 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/48 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B60N2/502 (EP,US);
B60R22/48 (US);
B60N2/002 (EP,US);
B60N2/0276 (EP,US);
B60N2/688 (EP,US);
B60R21/18 (EP,US);
B60R22/1951 (EP,US);
B60R22/1952 (EP,US);
B60R22/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | SITZSYSTEME MIT INTEGRIERTER SICHERHEITSFUNKTION | [2013/35] | English: | SAFETY INTEGRATED SEATING SYSTEMS | [2013/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE SIÈGE INTÉGRÉS SÉCURISÉS | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 01.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4849733 (CONIGLIARO THOMAS S [US], et al) [A] 9-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO0009368 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]) [X] 9-15 * page 23, line 20 - page 29, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6082715 (VANDERMOLEN GARY L [US]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [X]US6155601 (CANTOR ALAN EVERETT [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002089164 (ROUHANA STEPHEN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0035]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004036345 (HERBERG ARNOLD J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2008065374 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 26 * * page 19, line 6 - page 20, line 4; figures 8,9 *; | [X]US2009179406 (HARAOKA MUTSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0058]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]DE102008026410 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0053] - [0057]; figure 5c *; | [X]US2009309346 (VAN DRUFF CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2009322067 (NEZAKI TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0085] - [0091]; figures 4-9 * [Y] 7; | [X]US2010156084 (NEZAKI TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4849733 (CONIGLIARO THOMAS S [US], et al); | [Y]US6082715 (VANDERMOLEN GARY L [US]); | [X]US6155601 (CANTOR ALAN EVERETT [US], et al); | [X]US6305713 (PYWELL JAMES FREDERICK [US], et al); | [Y]US2002067031 (BUSGEN ALEXANDER [DE], et al); | [Y]US6476514 (SCHONDORF STEVEN YELLIN [US]); | [Y]US6729693 (SODERSTROM PONTUS [US], et al) |