|
21.03.2023 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
57 |