Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022147231 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | US201314124023 | 05.12.2013 | US202217581979 | 24.01.2022 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11249625 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | B2 | US2014109024 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10705696 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2017212667 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | US201715427936 | 08.02.2017 | US201314124023 | 05.12.2013 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3168733 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2020 | B1 | EP3168733 | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12814901 | 06.07.2012 | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108519839 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | CN201210236298 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108509113B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B | CN108509113 | 07.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | CN201210236298 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2732366 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | EP2732366 | 22.04.2015 | A4 | EP2732366 | 21.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014000461 | 21.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | WO2012JP04409 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013011651 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5799628B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B2 | JP2013025357 | 04.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102880406B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2018 | B | CN102880406 | 16.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011156530 | 15.07.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP3168733 |