EP2600619 - TRANSMITTER, TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKAGOSHI, Ikuo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/23] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12815404.4 | 03.07.2012 | WO2012JP67014 | Priority number, date | JP20110157199 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011157199 | [2013/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013011834 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600619 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N7/173, H04N21/434, H04N21/24, H04N21/43, H04N21/242, H04N21/8547, H04N21/236, H04N21/81 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
H04N21/23605 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N21/2401 (EP,US);
H04N21/2407 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/4343 (EP,US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
H04N21/8547 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | H04N13/00, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | SENDER, SENDEVERFAHREN UND EMPFÄNGER | [2013/23] | English: | TRANSMITTER, TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEIVER | [2013/23] | French: | ÉMETTEUR, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET RÉCEPTEUR | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2013 | Translation filed | 26.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 09.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004066846 (YUN KUGJIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0097] *; | [A]US2006171446 (TANAKA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,12,13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] *; | [X]US2011037833 (LEE DAE-JONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0286] * * paragraph [0290] - paragraph [0293] * * paragraph [0302] - paragraph [0306] * * paragraph [0347] - paragraph [0369] *; | [X]US2011134210 (TSUKAGOSHI IKUO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0241] * * paragraph [0287] - paragraph [0314] * * paragraph [0362] - paragraph [0364] * * paragraph [0377] * * paragraph [0393] - paragraph [0413] * * paragraph [0438] - paragraph [0446] * * paragraph [0539] - paragraph [0547] * * paragraph [0594] - paragraph [0607] * * paragraph [0627] - paragraph [0633] *; | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-avc075r40_ts_101154v011101_FhG_proposal_V1.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20110504), XP017833969 [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 30 - page 32 * | International search | [Y]JP2008085663 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2011030200 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2011030221 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2011030193 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2005006114 |