EP2734509 - METHODS FOR PREPARATION OF AMMONIUM SALTS OF C4 DIACIDS BY FERMENTATION AND INTEGRATED METHODS FOR MAKING C4 DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archer Daniels Midland Company 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | [2018/52] |
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Archer Daniels Midland Co. 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Chi-Cheng 756 Spyglass Ct. Forsyth, Illinois 62535 / US | 02 /
WERPY, Todd 117 Hightide Drive Decatur, Illinois 62521 / US | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/52] |
Former [2014/22] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12815444.0 | 09.07.2012 | [2018/52] | WO2012US45937 | Priority number, date | US201161510204P | 21.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161510204 P | US201161510209P | 21.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161510209 P | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013012590 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734509 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2734509 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/33, C07D207/267, C07C51/41, C07C51/42, C07C55/02, C07C55/10, C07C57/15, C07C59/245, C12P7/46 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
C07C51/42 (EP,CN,US);
C07D207/267 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/493 (US);
C07C29/149 (US);
C07C51/412 (EP,CN,US);
C07D307/33 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/46 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/412, C07C55/02 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C55/10 (CN,EP,US);
C07C51/412, C07C57/15 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C59/245 (CN,EP,US);
C07C51/42, C07C55/02 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/42, C07C55/10 (CN,EP,US); |
Former IPC [2014/22] | C07D307/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMMONIUMSALZEN AUS C4-DISÄUREN DURCH FERMENTATION UND INTEGRIERTE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG INTEGRIERTER C4-DERIVATE DAVON | [2014/22] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARATION OF AMMONIUM SALTS OF C4 DIACIDS BY FERMENTATION AND INTEGRATED METHODS FOR MAKING C4 DERIVATIVES THEREOF | [2014/22] | French: | MÉTHODES DE PRÉPARATION DE SELS D'AMMONIUM DE DIACIDES C4 PAR FERMENTATION ET MÉTHODES INTÉGRÉES DE FABRICATION DE DÉRIVÉS C4 DE CES DERNIERS | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 01.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2012 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | IE | 09.07.2019 | LU | 09.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.07.2012 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.07.2012 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5101045 (KOEHLER ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, lines 16-66 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-10 *; | [XY]WO02102772 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 4 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 9 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 12 * * page 20; table 1 * * page 24; table 3 * * claims 1-35 * [Y] 3-8,10-20; | [Y]EP1686183 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 16-20 * abstract * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-15 *; | [XY]WO2009024294 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 13, line l - page 14, line 22 * * claims 15-20 * [Y] 2-8,10-20; | [XAY]CA2625511 (DNP CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 6, lines 9-21 * * page 19, line 19 - page 21, line 6 * * claim 12 * [A] 9 [Y] 2-8,10-20; | [A]US2010044626 (FISCHER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * example 3 ** claims 16-30 *; | [XY]WO2010092155 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 24, line 11 - page 25, line 35 * * claims 27, 32, 33 * [Y] 2-8,10-20; | [XP]WO2011123269 (BIOAMBER SAS [CA], et al) [XP] 1,8,9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0064] * * examples 6-13 * * pages 1-20 * | International search | [Y]US2816923 (STEPHENSON ROBERT W); | [Y]US3113138 (FRANKO-FILIPASIC BORIVOJ R, et al); | [Y]US5008468 (KING DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US5969164 (BUDGE JOHN RAYMOND [US], et al); | [Y]US6603021 (WERPY TODD [US], et al); | [X]US7199250 (WERPY TODD A [US], et al); | [Y]US2010094051 (NISHI KIYOHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011002895 (NOVOZYMES NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al); | [XP]US2011245515 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [XP]US2011245514 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [XP]US8084626 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [XP]US2012015411 (DUBOIS JEAN-LUC [FR]); | [XP]US2012095241 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [XP]US8193375 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [XP]US8203021 (FRUCHEY OLAN S [US], et al); | [A] - CUKALOVIC ET AL., "Feasibility of production methods for succinic acid derivatives: a marriage of renewable resources and chemical technology", BIOPRODUCTS AND BIOREFINING, (200811), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 505 - 529, XP008139686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bbb.105 | [A] - MCKINLAY ET AL., "Prospects for a bio-based succinate industry", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 76, no. 4, pages 727 - 740, XP019538718 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-007-1057-y | [A] - BECHTHOLD ET AL., "Succinic Acid: A New Platform Chemical for Biobased Polymers from Renewable Resources", CHEMICAL ENGINNERING & TECHNOLOGY, (200805), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 647 - 654, XP055014231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ceat.200800063 | [A] - KURZROCK ET AL., "Recovery of succinic acid from fermentation broth", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2010), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 331 - 339, XP019787043 | by applicant | WO02102772 | EP1686183 | WO2009024294 | CA2625511 | WO2010092155 | WO2010147920 |