EP2796258 - SURFACING MATERIAL FOR LIGHTING APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/44] | ELECTROCONDUCTING COVER WITH INSULATING COATING | ||
[2015/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Machado Pinto Germano, João Manuel Avenida D. João II, Lote 1.03.2.1 Edificio Meridiano 2.°B 1990-092 Lisboa / PT | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Germano, Joâo Manuel Machado Pinto Avenida D. João II, Lote 1.03.2.1 Edificio Meridiano, 2.° B 1990-092 Lisboa / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHADO PINTO GERMANO, João Manuel Avenida D. João II Lote 1.03.2.1, Edificio Meridiano, 2.°B 1990-092 Lisboa / PT | 02 /
DOS SANTOS SILVA, Jorge Miguel Avenida D. João II Lote 1.03.2.1 Edificio Meridiano, 2.°B 1990-092 Lisboa / PT | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Silvestre de Almeida Ferreira, Luís Humberto Patentree Edifício Net Rua de Salazares 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Silvestre de Almeida Ferreira, Luís Humberto Edifício Net Rua de Salazares 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | Application number, filing date | 12815868.0 | 21.12.2012 | WO2012PT00053 | Priority number, date | PT20110106072 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: PT 2011106072 | [2014/44] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013095171 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | PT | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2796258 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B27J5/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B32B15/046 (EP,US);
B32B15/095 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B9/041 (EP);
F21V21/002 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
F21S8/03 (EP);
F21V19/0015 (EP);
F21W2121/00 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMATERIAL ZUR ANWENDUNG IN BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2015/35] | English: | SURFACING MATERIAL FOR LIGHTING APPLICATION | [2015/35] | French: | SURFACING MATÉRIEL POUR L'ECLAIRAGE APPLICATION | [2015/35] |
Former [2014/44] | ELEKTROLEITENDE ABDECKUNG MIT ISOLIERENDER BESCHICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/44] | ELECTROCONDUCTING COVER WITH INSULATING COATING | ||
Former [2014/44] | COUVERTURE DE REVÊTEMENT ISOLANTE ÉLECTROCONDUCTRICE | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2014 | Translation filed | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9966981 (LUGINGER HANS [AT]) [A] 1,2* page 1 - page 3; claims 1-2 *; | [A]EP2154427 (LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 1 - column 13; claims 1-20 * |