EP2796054 - METHOD FOR THE FORMULATION OF A GEL-FORMAT FOODSTUFF FOR USE AS A NUTRITIONAL FOODSTUFF ENRICHED WITH PEPTIDES AND MALTODEXTRINS OBTAINED FROM QUINOA FLOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad De Santiago De Chile Avenida Libertador Bernardo 0'Higgins 3363 Estacion Central Santiago / CL | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENRIONE CÁCERES Javier Ignacio Av.Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estacion central Santiago / CL | 02 /
DÍAZ CALDERON, Paulo Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estacion central Santiago / CL | 03 /
OSORIO LIRA, Fernando Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estacion central Santiago / CL | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12815988.6 | 13.12.2012 | [2015/48] | WO2012CL00073 | Priority number, date | CL201132362011 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: CL 32362011 | [2014/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013091125 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796054 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796054 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/12, A23L1/09, A23L1/10, A23L1/29, A23L1/305, A23L1/48 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A23J1/12 (EP,US);
A23L29/212 (EP,US);
A23L29/35 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMULIERUNG EINES LEBENSMITTELS IN GELFORM ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS NAHRHAFTES LEBENSMITTEL MIT PEPTIDEN UND MALTODEXTRINEN AUS QUINOAMEHL | [2014/44] | English: | METHOD FOR THE FORMULATION OF A GEL-FORMAT FOODSTUFF FOR USE AS A NUTRITIONAL FOODSTUFF ENRICHED WITH PEPTIDES AND MALTODEXTRINS OBTAINED FROM QUINOA FLOUR | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMULATION D'UN ALIMENT SOUS FORME DE GEL À UTILISER COMME ALIMENT NUTRITIONNEL, ENRICHI EN PEPTIDES ET MALTODEXTRINES ISSUES DE FARINE DE QUINOA | [2015/25] |
Former [2014/44] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMULTATION D'UN ALIMENT SOUS FORME DE GEL À UTILISER COMME ALIMENT NUTRITIONNEL, ENRICHI EN PEPTIDES ET MALTODEDXTRINES ISSUS DE FARINE DE QUINOA | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2014 | Translation filed | 18.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 19.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2012 | AL | 25.11.2015 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | IT | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | MT | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | IE | 13.12.2015 | LU | 13.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | DE | 01.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
DE | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007084754 (SAKURA PROPERTIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 16, line 29 - page 17, line 20 * * page 18, line 23 - line 25; claim 19 *; | [A]EP2098124 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031]; claims 3,4,7 *; | [A]US2010136144 (MSIKA PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0076]; claim 7 *; | [A]US2007092629 (SCANLIN LAURIE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031]; claims 5-8 *; | [A]US2010184963 (SCANLIN LAURIE A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0069]; examples 1,2 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * | [A] - ALUKO R E ET AL, "Functional and bioactive properties of Quinoa Seed protein hydrolysates", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, (20030101), vol. 68, no. 4, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2621.2003.TB09635.X, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 1254 - 1258, XP003014579 [A] 1-6 * page 1254, column right, paragraph last - page 1255, column left, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x | [A] - TAKAO TETSUYA ET AL, "Hypocholesterolemic effect of protein isolated from quinoa (Chenopodium quinoa Willd.) seeds", FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (20050501), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.3136/FSTR.11.161, ISSN 1344-6606, pages 161 - 167, XP009090450 [A] 1-6 * page 161, column right, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3136/fstr.11.161 | by applicant | CN101516450 | WO2005058249 | WO2009048938 | EP0515706 | - KREIDER, R; WILBORN, C; TAYLOR, L; CAMPBELL, B; ALMADA, A; COLLINS, R; COOKE, M; EARNEST, C; GREENWOOD, M; KALMAN, D, "ISSN exercise & sport nutrition review: research & recommendations", JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF SPORTS NUTRITION, (2010), vol. 7-7 | - YOTARO, K, "Nutricional Characteristics of Pseudocereal Amaranth and Quinoa: Alternative Foodstuff for Patients with Food Allergy", JOURNAL OF JAPANESE SOCIETY OF NUTRITION AND FOOD SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 55, pages 299 - 302 | - RUALES, J; NAIR, B, "Nutritional quality of the protein in quinoa (Chenopodium quinoa, Willd) seeds", PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION (FORMERLY QUALITAS PLANTARUM, (1992), vol. 42, pages 1 - 11 | - CRITTENDEN, R; BUCKLEY, J; CAMERON-SMITH, D; BROWN, A; THOMAS, K; DAVEY, S; HOBMAN, P, "Functional Dairy Protein Supplements for Elithe Athletes", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 64, pages 133 - 137 | - HARMON, JH; BURCKHARD, JR; SEIFERT, JG, "Ingestion of a Carbohydrate-Protein Supplement Improves Performance During Repeated Bouts of High Intensity Cycling", MEDICINE & SCIENCE IN SPORTS & EXERCISE, (2007), vol. 39, page S362 | - SAUNDERS, MJ; TODD, MK; VALENTINE, RJ; ST. LAURENT; TG, KANE; MD, LUDEN, ND; HERRICK, JE, "Inter-Study Examination of Physiological Variables Associated with Improved Endurance Performance with Carbohydrate/Protein Administration", MEDICINE & SCIENCE IN SPORTS & EXERCISE, (2006), vol. 38, pages S113 - S114 | - VALENTINE, RJ; ST. LAURENT, TG; SAUNDERS, MJ; TODD, MK; FLOHR, JA, "Comparison of Responses to Exercise When Consuming Carbohydrate and Carbohydrate/Protein Beverages", MEDICINE & SCIENCE IN SPORTS & EXERCISE, (2006), vol. 38, page S341 | - LUDEN, ND; SAUNDERS, MJ; PRATT, CA; BICKFORD, ASA; TODD, MK; FLOHR, JA, "Effects of a Six-Day Carbohyydrate/Protein Intervention on Muscle Damage, Soreness, and Performance In Runners", MEDICINE & SCIENCE IN SPORTS & EXERCISE, (2006), vol. 38, page S341 | - CRITTENDEN, R; BUCKLEY, J; CAMERON-SMITH, D; BROWN, A; THOMAS, K, DAVEY, S; HOBMAN, P, "Functional Dairy Protein Supplements for Elithe Athletes", AUSTRALIAN JOUMAL OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 64, pages 133 - 137 | - MORISHITA, M; KAMEI, N; EHARA, J; ISOWA, K; TAKAYAMA, K, "A novel approach using functional peptides for efficient intestinal absorption of insulin", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2007), vol. 118, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2006.12.022, pages 177 - 184, XP005912145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2006.12.022 | - MANNHEIM, A; CHERYAN, M, "Enzyme-Modified Proteins From Corn Gluten Meal: Preparation And Functional Properties", J AM OIL CHEM SOC., (1992), vol. 69, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02637674, pages 1163 - 1169, XP002172913 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02637674 | - ALUKO, R E; MONU, E, "Functional and Bioactive Properties of Quinoa Seed Protein Hydrolysates", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x, pages 1254 - 1258, XP003014579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x | - QI, M; HETTIARACHCHY, NS; KALAPATHY, U, "Solubility and Emulsifying Properties of Soy Protein Isolates Modified by Pancreatin", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 62, pages 1110 - 1115 | - "Chenopodium quinoa, Willd) seeds", PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION (FORMERLY QUALITAS PLANTARUM, (1992), vol. 42, pages 1 - 11 | - TANG, H; WATANABE, K; MITSUNAGA, T, "Characterization of storage starches from quinoa, barley and adzuki seeds", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2002), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/S0144-8617(01)00292-2, pages 13 - 22, XP004341984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(01)00292-2 | - ALUKO, R E; MONU, E, "Functional and Bioactive Properties of Quinoa Seed Protein Hydrolysates", JOUMAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x, pages 1254 - 1258, XP003014579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x | - ABUGOCH, L; CASTRO, E; TAPIA, C; ANON, MC; GAJARDO, P; VILLARROEL, A, "Stability of quinoa flour proteins (Chenopodium quinoa Willd.) during storage", INTERNATIONAL JOUMAL OF FOOD SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 44, pages 2013 - 2020 | - CAPERUTO, LC; AMAYA-FARFAN, J; CAMARGO, CRO, "Performance of quinoa (Chenopodium quinoa Willd) flour in the manufacture of gluten-free spaghetti", JOUMAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2001), vol. 81, doi:doi:10.1002/1097-0010(20010101)81:1<95::AID-JSFA786>3.0.CO;2-T, pages 95 - 101, XP000976915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0010(20010101)81:1<95::AID-JSFA786>3.0.CO;2-T | - JACOBSEN, SE; MUJICA, A; ORTIZ, R, "The Global Potential for Quinoa and Other Andean Crops", FOOD REVIEWS INTERNATIONAL, (2003), vol. 19, pages 139 - 148, XP009087743 | - ANCUROVA, M; MINAROVICOVÁ, L; DANDÁR, A, "Quinoa - A Review", CZECH JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 27, pages 71 - 79 | - SINHA, R; RADHA, C; PRAKASH, J; KAUL, P, "Whey protein hydrolysate: Functional properties, nutritional quality and utilization in beverage formulation", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1016/j.foodchem.2006.04.021, pages 1484 - 1491, XP005710458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2006.04.021 | - BARBOSA, CMS; MORAIS, HA; DELVIVO, FM; MANSUR, HS; DE OLIVEIRA, MC; SILVESTRE, MPC, "Papain hydrolysates of casein: molecular weight profile and encapsulation in lipospheres", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2004), vol. 84, pages 1891 - 1900 | - HARTMANN, R; MEISEL, H, "Food-derived peptides with biological activity: from research to food applications", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2007.01.013, pages 163 - 169, XP022032097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2007.01.013 | - TAKAO, T; WATANABE, N; YUHARA, K; ITOH, S; SUDA, S; TSURUOKA, Y; NAKATSUGAWA, K; KONISHI, Y, "Hypocholesterolemic effect of protein isolated from Quinoa (Chenopodium quinoa Willd.) seeds", FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.3136/fstr.11.161, pages 161 - 167, XP009090450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3136/fstr.11.161 | - ALUKO, RE; MONU, E, "Functional and Bioactive Properties of Quinoa Seed Protein Hydrolysates", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x, pages 1254 - 1258, XP003014579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb09635.x | - SOMOGYI, M., "Notes on sugar determination", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1952), vol. 195, pages 19 - 23 | MX20090007088 |