EP2737626 - BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR AND DUPLEXER USING BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Jea Shik c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Duck Hwan c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Young Il c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Chul Soo c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hyung Rak c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 06 /
SON, Sang Uk c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 07 /
SONG, In Sang c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Jae Chun c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Jacobs, Bart Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12817208.7 | 23.07.2012 | WO2012KR05847 | Priority number, date | KR20110074616 | 27.07.2011 Original published format: KR 20110074616 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013015581 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737626 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H9/17, H03H9/70 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H03H9/02102 (EP,US);
H03H9/17 (KR);
H01P1/213 (KR);
H03H9/171 (EP,US);
H03H9/173 (EP,US);
H03H9/174 (US);
H03H9/588 (US);
H03H9/70 (KR);
H03H9/706 (EP,US);
H10N30/20 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | H03H9/17, H03H9/70, H01P1/213 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | VOLUMENSCHALLWELLENRESONATOR UND DUPLEXER MIT DEM VOLUMENSCHALLWELLENRESONATOR | [2014/23] | English: | BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR AND DUPLEXER USING BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR | [2014/23] | French: | RÉSONATEUR D'ONDE ACOUSTIQUE EN VOLUME ET DUPLEXEUR UTILISANT UN RÉSONATEUR D'ONDE ACOUSTIQUE EN VOLUME | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 17.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 01.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4456850 (INOUE TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [XA]US2003006862 (TAKEUCHI MASAKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2005110598 (LARSON JOHN D III [US]); | [XAI]US2007222336 (GRANNEN KEVIN J [US], et al); | [XA]US2010182102 (KUYPERS JAN H [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2005051447 (TDK CORP); | [X]KR20050066104 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]JP2006295380 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |