Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9206134 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2015 | B2 | US2015031721 | 29.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102029951B | Global Dossier | 08.11.2019 | B1 | KR20140049004 | 24.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6099644B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B2 | JP2014524920 | 25.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL230580 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104024227B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2015 | B | CN104024227 | 03.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | CN201280036322 | 23.07.2012 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2842730 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2018 | C | CA2842730 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012289429B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2016 | B2 | AU2012289429 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2734504 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | B1 | EP2734504 | 31.12.2014 | A4 | EP2734504 | 28.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2606631T | 24.03.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201401310 | 29.04.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | WO2012CN79058 | 23.07.2012 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013013609 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110209657 | 25.07.2011 | CN201110207175 | 22.07.2011 | CN201110211297 | 26.07.2011 |