EP2737741 - MONITORING MOBILE APPLICATION ACTIVITIES FOR MALICIOUS TRAFFIC ON A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seven Networks, LLC 2660 East End Blvd. S. Marshall TX 75672 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Seven Networks, Inc. 959 Skyway Road Suite 100 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNA, Michael 519 Curie Drive San Jose, CA 94123 / US | 02 /
BOTT, Ross 152 Poplar Street Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12817532.0 | 11.07.2012 | WO2012US46317 | Priority number, date | US201161512278P | 27.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512278 P | US201213546995 | 11.07.2012 Original published format: US201213546995 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013015994 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737741 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/12, H04W88/02, G06F21/00, // G06F21/55, G06F21/56, H04W12/08 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
G06F12/1408 (US);
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
G06F21/60 (US);
G06F3/0623 (US);
G06F3/0653 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US);
H04W12/12 (US);
H04W12/128 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | H04W12/12, H04W88/02, G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DER AKTIVITÄTEN VON MOBILANWENDUNGEN FÜR BÖSWILLIGEM VERKEHR AUF EINER MOBILER VORRICHTUNG | [2014/23] | English: | MONITORING MOBILE APPLICATION ACTIVITIES FOR MALICIOUS TRAFFIC ON A MOBILE DEVICE | [2014/23] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DES ACTIVITÉS DES APPLICATIONS MOBILES À LA RECHERCHE D'UN TRAFIC MALVEILLANT SUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 27.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007123214 (MOCK VON A [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] - [0019] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 4-15; | [XI]US2008086773 (TUVELL GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0061] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2,10; | [XI]US2009254969 (PARKER BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,12-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] , [0030] , [0045] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0063] - [0066] , [0067] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,5,6,8-11; | [XI]EP2159730 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0079] - [0094] * * figures 1-11 *[I] 4-15; | [XI]US2011161452 (POORNACHANDRAN RAJESH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,12-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0037] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 2,5,6,8-11; | [XI] - JERRY CHENG ET AL, "SmartSiren: Virus Detection and Alert for Smartphones", MOBISYS '07 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE SYSTEMS, APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES; JUNE 11 - 14, 2007, SAN JUAN, PR, USA, ACM, NEW YORK, USA, (20070601), doi:10.1145/1247660.1247690, ISBN 978-1-59593-614-1, pages 258 - 271, XP007910825 [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 2,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1247660.1247690 | International search | [Y]US2007039049 (KUPFERMAN MICHAEL [IL], et al); | [Y]WO2009132700 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]US2011083186 (NIEMELA JARNO [FI], et al) | by applicant | US2007123214 | US2008086773 | US2009254969 | EP2159730 | US2011161452 | - JERRY CHENG; ET AL.,, "SmartSiren: Virus Detection and Alert for Smartphones", MOBISYS '07 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE SYSTEMS, APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES;, (20070611), pages 258 - 271 |