EP2748954 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SECONDARY CELL UPLINK SYNCHRONIZATION STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Boon Loong C/O Samsung Electronics Co. LTD. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gerardus Johannes Petrus C/O Samsung Electronics Co. LTD. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 03 /
ZHANG, Jianzhong C/O Samsung Electronics Co. LTD. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Kyeong-In C/O Samsung Electronics Co. LTD. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Soeng-Hun C/O Samsung Electronics Co. LTD. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/27] | Application number, filing date | 12818104.7 | 27.07.2012 | WO2012KR06042 | Priority number, date | US201161512855P | 28.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512855 P | US201161512783P | 28.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512783 P | US201213554893 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: US201213554893 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013015660 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2748954 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04W56/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,KR,US);
H04J11/0076 (KR);
H04W56/001 (KR,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2675 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | H04J11/00, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SEKUNDÄRZELLEN-UPLINK-SYNCHRONISATIONSSTATUS | [2014/27] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SECONDARY CELL UPLINK SYNCHRONIZATION STATES | [2014/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À LA COMMANDE DES ÉTATS DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS LE SENS MONTANT D'UNE CELLULE SECONDAIRE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110405), no. V10.1.0, pages 1 - 53, XP050477203 [I] 1-13 * page 32 - page 33 * * page 9 - page 18 * | [A] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Multiple Timing Advance", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-111897 MULTIPLE TA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110405), vol. RAN WG2, no. Shanghai, China; 20110411, XP050494476 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2011134774 (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA], et al); | [X]WO2011085200 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | [A]US2011170418 (SAAGFORS MATS [FI], et al); | [A] - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "The need of maintaining multiple TA timers", 3GPP TSG-RAN W G2 73BIS, (20110411), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_73bis/Docs, XP050494392 | [A] - MEDIATEK INC., "Handover with Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 69, (20100226), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_69/Docs, (20130108), XP050421757 | by applicant | WO2011085200 |