EP2736616 - SELECTIVE TWO-STAGE HYDROPROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company Box 5000 Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSEOGLU, Omer, Refa P.O. Box 8560 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12819038.6 | 27.07.2012 | WO2012US48473 | Priority number, date | US201161513230P | 29.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161513230 P | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013019592 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2736616 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/04, C10G65/12 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
B01D11/043 (EP,US);
B01J19/006 (EP,US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B01J8/22 (EP,US);
B01J8/40 (EP,US);
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00768 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1096 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/44 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGES SELEKTIVES HYDRIERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/23] | English: | SELECTIVE TWO-STAGE HYDROPROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'HYDROTRAITEMENT À DEUX ÉTAGES SÉLECTIF ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2018 | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2015 | Decision despatched | 23.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2019 | 31.07.2020 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2020 | 31.07.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2967146 (MANLEY ROBERT E) [Y] 1-6 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 19-20,29-42,51-53 * * column 2, lines 3-13,23-68 * * column 3, lines 61-75 ** column 4, lines 5-25,45-69 *; | [Y]WO02074882 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 8, line 3 - page 11, line 32; figure 1 * * page 3, lines 3-20 * * page 4, lines 11-13,19-27 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 1 * * page 5, lines 7-12 * * page 6, lines 16-20 * * page 12, lines 2-6, 11-13 *; | [XY]US2004163996 (COLYAR JAMES J [US]) [X] 7 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0013] - [0014] - [0019] , [0021] - [0023] - [0034] - [0036] - [0040] - [0044] * * tables 1-2 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]US2011132803 (UMANSKY BENJAMIN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0012] - [0013] - [0026] - [0030] * * figure 2; example 2 * | Examination | US4354922 |