Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9144752 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2015 | B2 | US2013062251 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213559839 | 27.07.2012 | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101945568B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2019 | B1 | KR20140064816 | 28.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48473 | 27.07.2012 | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6054964B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | JP2014521785 | 28.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48473 | 27.07.2012 | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103781883B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2016 | B | CN103781883 | 07.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48473 | 27.07.2012 | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2736616 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48473 | 27.07.2012 | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013019592 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2013 | A3 | WO2013019592 | 07.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161513230 | 29.07.2011 |