Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014158278 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214232931 | 31.07.2012 | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140043829 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101784127B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B1 | KR20160073430 | 24.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5844901B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B2 | JP2014529753 | 13.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103717405B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2018 | B | CN103717405 | 09.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2739485 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | B1 | EP2739485 | 03.06.2015 | A4 | EP2739485 | 11.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014002510 | 14.03.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2844368 | 07.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48923 | 31.07.2012 | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013019766 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2013 | A3 | WO2013019766 | 07.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161514329 | 02.08.2011 |