EP2717043 - PLATE-TYPE CAPILLARY COLUMN, CAPILLARY COLUMN UNIT, AND CHROMATOGRAPHY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horiba Stec, Co., Ltd. 11-5, Hokodate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8116 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKA, Takahiro c/o HORIBA STEC Co. Ltd. 11-5 Hokodate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8116 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12819752.2 | 03.08.2012 | WO2012JP69893 | Priority number, date | JP20110171301 | 04.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011171301 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013018903 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717043 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/60, G01N30/46 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G01N30/6095 (EP,US);
G01N30/606 (US);
B01D53/025 (US);
G01N30/467 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8881 (EP,US);
G01N30/468 (EP,US);
G01N30/6039 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | PLATTENARTIGE KAPILLARSÄULE, KAPILLARSÄULENEINHEIT UND CHROMATOGRAFIE DAMIT | [2014/15] | English: | PLATE-TYPE CAPILLARY COLUMN, CAPILLARY COLUMN UNIT, AND CHROMATOGRAPHY USING SAME | [2014/15] | French: | COLONNE CAPILLAIRE DE TYPE À PLATEAU, UNITÉ DE COLONNE CAPILLAIRE, ET CHROMATOGRAPHIE L'UTILISANT | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2013 | Translation filed | 03.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5690763 (ASHMEAD JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 12, line 9 - line 19; figures 5,11 * [Y] 3,13,14; | [Y]WO0141931 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * page 85, paragraph 2 - page 88, paragraph 2; figures 26-29 *; | [A]US6699392 (MANGINELL RONALD P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,13,14* the whole document *; | [YA]EP1489045 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0047]; figures 7,10 * [A] 1,4,5,7,13,14; | [A]US2009272270 (MCGILL R ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0058] *; | [A]WO2011044350 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 8-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS60142254 (SORD COMPUTER SYST); | [A]JPS61288154 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US4935040 (GOEDERT MICHEL G [US]); | [Y]JP2006090813 (YAMATAKE CORP); | [A]JP2007033442 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) | by applicant | JPH05180821 | JP2006090813 |