EP2740092 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING NOTIFICATIONS RELATED TO NEW MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redbox Automated Retail, LLC One Tower Lane Oak Brook Terrace, IL 60181 / US | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASKATIA, Imran 1049 Nicklaus Avenue Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
RUBINSTEIN, Jason 1322 W. Deerpath Road Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12820189.4 | 31.07.2012 | WO2012US49074 | Priority number, date | US201161514448P | 02.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161514448 P | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013019818 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2740092 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F16/435 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BENACHRICHTIGUNGEN BEZÜGLICH NEUER MEDIEN | [2014/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING NOTIFICATIONS RELATED TO NEW MEDIA | [2014/24] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE GÉNÉRER DES ALERTES RELATIVES À DE NOUVEAUX SUPPORTS | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US7234609 (DELAZZER MICHAEL [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2004139173 (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al); | [A]US2004158503 (GROSS JOHN N [US]); | [Y]US2010093324 (GUPTA VIKRAM MAKAM [US], et al); | [A]KR20110036410 (BROADBAND MEDIA CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2011107374 (ROBERTS BRIAN F [US], et al) |