EP2739670 - SOL-GEL DERIVED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABS Materials, Inc. 770 Spruce Street Wooster, OH 44691 / US | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDMISTON, Paul, L. 1909 Old Mansfield Road Wooster, OH 44691 / US | 02 /
SPOONAMORE, Stephen, R. 1909 Old Mansfield Road Wooster, OH 44691 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
EDMISTON, Paul, L. 1909 Old Mansfield Road Wooster, OH 44691 / US | ||
02 /
SPOONAMORE, Stephen, R. 1909 Old Mansfield Road Wooster, OH 44691 / US | |||
Former [2014/24] | 01 /
EDMISTON, Paul, L. 770 Spruce Street Wooster, OH 44691 / US | ||
02 /
SPOONAMORE, Stephen, R. 770 Spruce Street Wooster, OH 44691 / US | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Dentons UKMEA LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2014/24] | Hill, Justin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 12820297.5 | 02.08.2012 | [2023/41] | WO2012US49359 | Priority number, date | US201161514465P | 02.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161514465 P | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013019965 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739670 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739670 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/04, C08G77/60 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
C08G77/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS SOL-GEL | [2014/24] | English: | SOL-GEL DERIVED COMPOSITIONS | [2014/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ISSUES DE SOL-GEL | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2020 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2014 | 31.08.2021 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2022 | 31.08.2023 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SI | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2024/49] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SI | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1262233 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-15 * page 2, paragraphs 6-7 * * page 3, paragraphs 9-13,17 * * example 2 *[Y] 4,12; | [XP]WO2012019033 (ABS MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraphs 20-21 * * page 5, paragraphs 24,27-29 * * page 6, paragraph 31 * * page 7, paragraph 37 * * claims 5,18 *; | [XY] - WALKER ET AL, "Selective detection of gas-phase TNT by integrated optical waveguide spectrometry using molecularly imprinted sol-gel sensing films", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070612), vol. 593, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ACA.2007.04.034, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 82 - 91, XP022233522 [X] 1-15 * page 82, column 2, line 17 - page 83, column 2, line 2 * * figure 1 * * page 84, paragraph 2.3 * * tables 1,2 and 3 * [Y] 4,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2007.04.034 | International search | [Y]US2002070168 (JIANG ZHIPING [US], et al); | [A]US2006292033 (BLOK EDWARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2007112242 (EDMISTON PAUL L [US]); | [A]US2009294726 (HAMADA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US2010092840 (KONNO YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [A]US2011000658 (TANAKA SATOSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP1262233 | US7790830 | WO2012019033 |