EP2738147 - COLORED AND LIGHT-TRANSMITTING SINTERED ZIRCONIA COMPACT AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJISAKI, Hiroyuki c/o Tosoh Corporation Nanyo Complex 4560 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Kiyotaka c/o Tosoh Corporation Nanyo Complex 4560 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 03 /
IMAI, Kohei c/o Tosoh Corporation Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/23] | Application number, filing date | 12820547.3 | 27.07.2012 | [2021/52] | WO2012JP69232 | Priority number, date | JP20110166358 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011166358 | JP20110166359 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011166359 | [2014/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013018728 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2738147 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2738147 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/48, A61C7/14, A61C13/083 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
A61L27/047 (EP,US);
C04B35/48 (KR,US);
A61C13/082 (US);
A61C13/083 (KR);
A61C7/14 (KR,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/44 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
C04B2235/765 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/785 (EP,US);
C04B2235/81 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9615 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9653 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9669 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄRBTER UND LICHTDURCHLÄSSIGER SINTER-ZIRKONIUMPRESSLING UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/23] | English: | COLORED AND LIGHT-TRANSMITTING SINTERED ZIRCONIA COMPACT AND USE OF SAME | [2014/23] | French: | CORPS COMPACT FRITTÉ EN OXYDE DE ZIRCONIUM COLORÉ ET TRANSMETTANT LA LUMIÈRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2014 | Translation filed | 28.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21212172.7 / EP4011852 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.2022
29.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Dental Direkt GmbH Industriezentrum 106-108 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | 02
28.09.2022
29.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE DOCERAM medical ceramics GmbH Heßlingsweg 65-67 44309 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2022/44] | 14.10.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2024 | 13.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2012 | AL | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | MT | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | TR | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | IE | 27.07.2022 | LU | 27.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
TR | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
LU | 27.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6259571 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1857428 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * Paragraphs: [ 0001], [0026], [0027], [0038]; Abstract.;; claims 1,4 *; | [XY]EP1859757 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [X] 1-3,5-9,12,14 * Page 9, examples 2,4,6,8,10; claims 39, 40, 47,48; paragraphs [0001], [0003],[0007], [0009], [0074], [0076], [0061], [0062] * [Y] 4,10,11,13; | [Y]JP2008050246 (TOSOH CORP) [Y] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6259571 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [Y]JP2006298711 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2008050246 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2008050247 (TOSOH CORP); | [A]JP2011020876 (TOSOH CORP); | [XP]JP2012116745 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y] - HITOSHI NAGAYAMA, "Color Zirconia Shoketsutai no Kaihatsu", TOSOH RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, (2009), vol. 53, pages 53 - 56, XP008172575 | by applicant | JP2008050247 | JP2009207743 | WO2009125793 | JP2010501465 | Opposition | JP2008050246 | EP2045222 | EP2263988 |