EP2796756 - SAFETY DISCHARGE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huo, Gang Room 302 Unit 4 Building 48 No.18 Xingrong West Street Dongying District, Dongying Shandong 257073 / CN | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12820755.2 | 01.08.2012 | [2016/24] | WO2012CN79478 | Priority number, date | CN201110220709 | 03.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110220709 | [2014/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013017080 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796756 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796756 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/02, F16K17/00, F16K31/524, F16K41/00, F16K43/00, F16K11/14, B63G8/22, B63B13/00 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
F16K31/52441 (EP,US);
F16K1/34 (US);
F16K11/14 (EP,US);
F16K17/0413 (US);
F16K17/0446 (US);
F16K17/0473 (US);
F16K27/0227 (US);
F16K41/003 (EP,US);
F16K43/00 (EP,US);
B63B13/00 (EP,US);
B63G8/22 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87981 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88054 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | F16K11/02, F16K17/00, F16K31/524, F16K41/00, F16K43/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/44] | F16K11/02, F16K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSAUSLASSVENTIL | [2014/44] | English: | SAFETY DISCHARGE VALVE | [2014/44] | French: | SOUPAPE DE REFOULEMENT DE SÉCURITÉ | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2014 | Translation filed | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 22.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2014 | Decision despatched | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PL, FI, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2012 | AL | 15.06.2016 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BE | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | IE | 01.08.2016 | LU | 01.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4832078 (SZEKELY LAJOS [HU], et al); | [A]CN1197181 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [A]CN1598374 (HUNAN PUMP VALVE MFG CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1982767 (HUO GANG [CN]); | [XP]CN102401151 (GANG HUO); | [XP]CN202349259U (GANG HUO) | by applicant | CN20051045517 |