EP2797685 - PROCESS FOR CARRYING OUT A REACTION INVOLVING A LIQUID REACTION MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furanix Technologies B.V. Zekeringstraat 29 1014 BV Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Furanix Technologies B.V Zekeringstraat 29 1014 BV Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SOUSA DIAS, Ana Sofia Vagueiro c/o 29 Zekeringstraat NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN DER WAAL, Jan Cornelis c/o 29 Zekeringstraat NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
MAZOYER, Etienne c/o 29 Zekeringstraat NL-1014 BV Amsterdam / NL | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/45] | Application number, filing date | 12821203.2 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012NL50932 | Priority number, date | NL20112008047 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: NL 2008047 | US201161580845P | 28.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161580845 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013100768 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2797685 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/08, B01J29/08, B01J29/18, B01J29/40, B01J29/60, B01J29/70, C07C45/66 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C07D307/48 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J29/08 (EP,US);
B01J29/18 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER REAKTION MIT EINEM FLÜSSIGEN REAKTIONSGEMISCH | [2014/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR CARRYING OUT A REACTION INVOLVING A LIQUID REACTION MIXTURE | [2014/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UNE RÉACTION IMPLIQUANT UN MÉLANGE RÉACTIONNEL LIQUIDE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007146636 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 40 *; | [X]US4752596 (BERGNA HORACIO E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 3 - line 30; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9942214 (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 10, line 43 - column 12, line 19; example -; claim - * | [X] - KALPESH B. SIDHPURIA ET AL, "Supported ionic liquid silica nanoparticles (SILnPs) as an efficient and recyclable heterogeneous catalyst for the dehydration of fructose to 5-hydroxymethylfurfural", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20110101), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1039/c0gc00690d, ISSN 1463-9262, page 340, XP055019759 [X] 1-15 * page 344 - page 348 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0gc00690d | by applicant | US3152998 | US4146741 | WO9942214 | WO2007104514 | WO2007104515 | - R.M. RAVENELLE ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2010), vol. 114, pages 19582 - 19595 | - H. VAN BEKKUM ET AL., Introduction to Zeolite Science and Practice, ELSEVIER, page 828 |