|
10.08.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.10.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.2020 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2020 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |