EP2739454 - POLYMER BLEND MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema, Inc. 900 First Avenue King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAR, Walter 1324 Dimity Court Pottstown, PA 19465 / US | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Albani, Dalila Arkema France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12821396.4 | 01.08.2012 | WO2012US49091 | Priority number, date | US201161515446P | 05.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161515446 P | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013022660 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739454 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/00 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D67/00111 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D2325/34 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/16, C08L27/16, C08L39/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Title | German: | POLYMERMISCHUNGSMEMBRANEN | [2014/24] | English: | POLYMER BLEND MEMBRANES | [2014/24] | French: | MEMBRANES EN MÉLANGE DE POLYMÈRE | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 10.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/35] | 23.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2021 | 15.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Appeal following examination | 05.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T0560/20 | 17.02.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1063256 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]US2006178480 (TADA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2008156722 (SUZUKI KENICHI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]US5279739 (PEMAWANSA K P [US]); | [Y]US2005029186 (MULLER HEINZ-JOACHIM [AU]); | [X]US2008078718 (TADA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3178399 |