EP2607410 - LIGHT-DIFFUSING NON-COMBUSTIBLE COMPOSITE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOI, Kohei c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAKI, Kunio c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
SUGINO, Yusuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
HIDA, Takafumi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
NAKAYAMA, Yusuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 06 /
HIRANO, Keisuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12821558.9 | 27.07.2012 | WO2012JP69106 | Priority number, date | JP20110173008 | 08.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011173008 | [2013/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013021837 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607410 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08J5/24, C08J5/10, G02B5/02, G02B1/10 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
C08J5/043 (EP,US);
B32B17/04 (KR);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/04 (KR);
C08J5/10 (EP,US);
C08J5/244 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
F21V11/02 (US);
F21V5/00 (KR);
G02B1/00 (US);
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
G02B1/105 (EP);
G02B5/0236 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
C08G77/045 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/0025 (EP,US);
G02B6/0065 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08K3/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | C08J5/08, C08K7/14, C08L83/04, G02B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTSTREUENDES UND NICHT BRENNBARES VERBUNDELEMENT | [2013/26] | English: | LIGHT-DIFFUSING NON-COMBUSTIBLE COMPOSITE MEMBER | [2013/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT COMPOSITE DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE NON COMBUSTIBLE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2013 | Translation filed | 20.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 18.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE2255576 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 5, lines 5-14,23-27; example -; claims 1,10,13 * * page 6, lines 4-5 * [A] 7 [I] 3,6; | [XAI]WO9516751 (BP CHEMICALS HITCO INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, lines 2-28; claims 1,2,13,15,17,22,24,26-29 * * page 6, lines 1-10 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 1 * * page 11, lines 16-17 * * page 12, lines 8-10,18-21 * * page 14, lines 1-5 * [A] 7 [I] 2,3,6; | [XAI]DE102005030580 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0006]; claim 1 * [A] 7[I] 2,3,6 | International search | [A]JP2010174116 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [A]WO2010119903 (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011006610 (NAGASE CHEMTEX CORP); | [A]WO2011037083 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2011190402 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [AP]JP4804595B (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JPS53112732 | JPS579051 | JPS5751653 | JP4359967B | JP4491778B | JP4539349B | - WERNER STOBER ET AL., J. COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCI., (1968), vol. 26, pages 62 - 69 | - RICKEY D. BADLEY ET AL., LANGMUIR, (1990), vol. 6, pages 792 - 801 | - JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF COLOUR MATERIAL, (1988), vol. 61, no. 9, pages 488 - 493 |