EP2744099 - A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REALIZING THE CHANGE OF INPUT POWER WITH LOAD AND ROTATING SPEED SIMULTANEOUSLY, BY DRIVING MULTIPLE ELECTRIC MOTORS VIA ONE INVERTER BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/25] | A CONTROL SYSTEM TO REALIZE INPUT POWER CHANGING ALONG WITH BOTH LOADS AND ROTATE SPEED BY AN INVERTER BRIDGE DRAGGING MANY SETS OF MOTORS | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhou, Shunxin 5-1-311 Shanggang Road Xiling Yichang, Hubei 443002 / CN | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2014/25] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12821628.0 | 28.06.2012 | [2019/19] | WO2012CN00885 | Priority number, date | CN201110231539 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110231539 | [2014/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013020355 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744099 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2744099 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/74, H02P27/04 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H02P6/005 (EP,US);
H02P27/08 (US);
H02P23/26 (US);
H02P2201/15 (EP,US);
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P27/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN STEUERSYSTEM ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER EINGANGSLEISTUNG IN ABHÄNGIGKEITEN VON LASTEN UND DREHZAHLEN DURCH NUR EINEN UMRICHTER, WELCHER MEHRERE MOTORSÄTZE VERSORGT | [2018/39] | English: | A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REALIZING THE CHANGE OF INPUT POWER WITH LOAD AND ROTATING SPEED SIMULTANEOUSLY, BY DRIVING MULTIPLE ELECTRIC MOTORS VIA ONE INVERTER BRIDGE | [2019/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE PERMETTANT DE VARIER LA PUISSANCE D'ENTRÉE AVEC LES CHARGES ET LES VITESSES DE ROTATION PAR UN INVERSEUR FOURNISSANT PLUSIEURS GROUPES DE MOTEURS | [2018/39] |
Former [2014/25] | STEUERSYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER EINGANGSLEISTUNGSÄNDERUNG ENTLANG ZWEIER LASTEN UND ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER DREHGESCHWINDIGKEIT DURCH EINE WECHSELRICHTERBRÜCKE ZUM ZIEHEN VIELER SÄTZE VON MOTOREN | ||
Former [2014/25] | A CONTROL SYSTEM TO REALIZE INPUT POWER CHANGING ALONG WITH BOTH LOADS AND ROTATE SPEED BY AN INVERTER BRIDGE DRAGGING MANY SETS OF MOTORS | ||
Former [2014/25] | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR RÉALISER UN CHANGEMENT D'ÉNERGIE D'ENTRÉE EN MÊME TEMPS QUE LES CHARGES ET LA VITESSE DE ROTATION AU MOYEN D'UN PONT D'ONDULEUR QUI ENTRAÎNE DE NOMBREUX JEUX DE MOTEURS | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2014 | Translation filed | 27.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2012 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 28.06.2019 | LU | 28.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001178192 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1796259 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]US2007247104 (GARZA FILIBERTO D [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,8-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010033123 (ZHOU SHUNXIN [CN]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,8-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CN2122450U (DONG YOUZHANG [CN]); | [A]JP2005341799 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]CN101262192 (SHUNXIN ZHOU [CN]); | [Y]CN101340174 (SHUNXIN ZHOU [CN]); | [XP]CN202135093U (SHUNXIN ZHOU) | by applicant | - Practical Manual For Energy-Saving Reforming On An Electric Motor, SHANGHAI SCIENCE PUBLISHING HOUSE | CN20081094147 | CN20081048252 | CN20081048732 |