EP2742497 - PROXIMITY TAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acco Brands Corporation Four Corporate Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60047-8997 / US | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVACUITI, John 4431 Cove Cliff Road North Vancouver, British Columbia V7G 1H7 / CA | 02 /
FENNIG, Kelly 305-423 Agnes Street New Westminster, British Columbia V3L 1G2 / CA | 03 /
GUTIERREZ, Gerald 10351 Sandiford Drive Richmond, British Columbia V7E 5S6 / CA | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 12821726.2 | 09.08.2012 | WO2012US50195 | Priority number, date | US201161521660P | 09.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521660 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013023091 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742497 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/02, H04B7/24, H04M1/725, G08B13/14, H04M1/67, H04M1/04, H04W12/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
G08B13/1427 (EP,US);
H04M1/67 (EP,US);
H04M1/7246 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | G08B21/24, H04B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSETIKETT | [2014/25] | English: | PROXIMITY TAG | [2014/25] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE DE PROXIMITÉ | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 08.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007107749 (AHMED SHAHOOD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * page 1, lines 12-17 * * page 4, lines 20-29 * * page 6, line 32 - page 12, line 33 * * page 15, line 13 - page 17, line 12 * * figures 1-8 *; | [I]US2008014869 (DEMIRBASA SABAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0175] * * paragraph [0253] ** figures 1-8 * | International search | [Y]US2004178907 (CORDOBA JUAN CARLOS [SE]); | [Y]KR100660299B (LEE SANG BUM); | [A]US2009079567 (PATEL CHIRAG VITHALBHAI [US]); | [A]US2010062743 (JONSSON MATTIAS [SE]) | by applicant | WO2007107749 |