EP2742154 - BIOMARKER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caris Life Sciences Switzerland Holdings GmbH St. Jakobs Strasse 199 Citygate 4052 Basel / CH | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Caris Life Sciences Luxembourg Holdings, S.a.r.l. Rue De Maraichers L2124 Grand-duche De Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Kirk 127 Greenwood Avenue Swampscott, MA 01907 / US | 02 /
PAWLOWSKI, Traci 26071 Anacapa Street Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | 03 /
SPETZLER, David 13539 N. 95th Way Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2015/14] | 01 /
BROWN, Kirk 127 Greenwood Avenue Swampscott Massachusetts 01907 / US | ||
02 /
PAWLOWSKI, Traci 2014 N Milkweed Loop Phoenix, AZ 85037 / US | |||
03 /
SPETZLER, David 13539 N. 95th Way Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | |||
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
BROWN, Kirk 14256 North Coral Gables Drive Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | ||
02 /
PAWLOWSKI, Traci 2014 N Milkweed Loop Phoenix, AZ 85037 / US | |||
03 /
SPETZLER, David 13539 N. 95th Way Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12821745.2 | 08.08.2012 | WO2012US50030 | Priority number, date | US201161521333P | 08.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521333 P | US201161523763P | 15.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161523763 P | US201161526623P | 23.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161526623 P | US201161529762P | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161529762 P | US201161534352P | 13.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161534352 P | US201161537462P | 21.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537462 P | US201161542639P | 03.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161542639 P | US201161551674P | 26.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161551674 P | US201161559676P | 14.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161559676 P | US201261612111P | 16.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261612111 P | US201261619803P | 03.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261619803 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013022995 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742154 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/50, G01N33/574, G01N33/68, G01N33/566 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/53 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (CN);
G01N33/566 (EP);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N33/57434 (CN);
G01N33/57484 (CN);
G01N33/6842 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (CN);
C12Q2600/158 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | BIOMARKERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAMIT | [2014/25] | English: | BIOMARKER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2014/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BIOMARQUEURS ET PROCÉDÉS | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 09.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2014 | 31.08.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008092153 (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15* example 2; claim 10 *; | [X]WO2009015357 (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * p10 last par;; figure 8 *; | [X]WO2010056337 (CARIS MPI INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * par [00126]; par [00683];; claims 1,10,11,16,24,72 *; | [X] - T. DENG ET AL, "Abstract 444: Subpopulations of circulating microvesicles have different microRNA profiles", CANCER RESEARCH, (20110415), vol. 71, no. 8 Supplement, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2011-444, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 444 - 444, XP055168378 [X] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2011-444 | [X] - Ta Deng ET AL, "Subpopulations of Circulating Microvesicles Have Different MicroRNA Profiles", (20110407), URL: http://www.carislifesciences.com/media/pdf/Spetzler-sorted-MiRs-AACR-poster-2011.pdf, (20150209), XP055168385 [X] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * | [X] - Traci Pawlowski ET AL, "Circulating exosomes may provide an alternate platform to monitor disease progression compared to circulating tumor cells CD-81 Labeled Exosome Level vs CTCs in Plasma Derived Exosomes miR-21 Copy Number vs CTCs in EpCAM+ Plasma Derived Exosomes", (20100705), URL: http://www.carislifesciences.com/media/pdf/ASCO_Pawlowski2010.pdf, (20150209), XP055168408 [X] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2004038207 (ORNTOFT TORBEN F [DK]); | [Y]US2005152908 (LIEW CHOONG-CHIN [CA], et al); | [Y]US2008085524 (LOIS AUGUSTO [US]); | [Y]US2009203533 (MUNNES MARC [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010248225 (BANKAITIS-DAVIS DANUTE M [US], et al); | [Y]US2010248290 (LAM STEPHEN [CA], et al); | [X]US2011151460 (KLASS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2011166030 (WANG YIXIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2011177054 (GIBBINGS DERRICK [FR], et al) |