EP2742078 - USE OF THICKENING AGENTS AS POLYURETHANE AMINE CATALYST DILUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Petrochemical LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILTZ JR., Eugene P. 31 N. Yorkgate Court The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 02 /
RIDGWAY, Donald -"- "deceased" / US | 03 /
CHAVEZ, Jennifer 2125 Colquitt Street Houston, TX 77098 / US | 04 /
RODRIGUEZ, Frank 8101 Research Forest Drive 10208 The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 05 /
GRIGSBY, Jr. Robert, A. 30211 East Legends Trail Drive Spring, TX 77386 / US | 06 /
WHITCOMBE, Gwynne Tramlaan 454 B-1933 Sterrebeck / BE | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Neirynck, Katrien Gerda Noëlla, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 12822566.1 | 10.08.2012 | WO2012US50273 | Priority number, date | US201161522349P | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161522349 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013023125 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2742078 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/20 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
C08G18/0842 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/1833 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/18 (US);
C08G18/302 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERDICKUNGSMITTELN ALS POLYURETHAN-AMINKATALYSATOR-VERDÜNNUNGSMITTEL | [2014/25] | English: | USE OF THICKENING AGENTS AS POLYURETHANE AMINE CATALYST DILUENTS | [2014/25] | French: | UTILISATION D'AGENTS ÉPAISSISSANTS EN TANT QUE DILUANTS D'UN CATALYSEUR AMINE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POLYURÉTHANE | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3573234 (ARCHIPOFF ALEXIS, et al) [X] 1-7,11-15 * example 1 *; | [X]US4521544 (KENNEDY RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1-4,11-15 * example II ** column 3, lines 44-53 *; | [X]US5968995 (RIZK SIDKY D [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 1 * * column 8, lines 58-67 * | International search | [Y]US3445277 (SMITH LEONARD); | [A]US4560724 (BRABETZ HARTMUT [DE], et al); | [X]US5968995 (RIZK SIDKY D [US], et al); | [A]US2004122166 (O'BRIEN-BERNINI FRANK C [US], et al); | [A]WO2011026720 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE], et al) |