EP2741823 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING SPERM FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Androgenix Ltd Level 5 101 Customs Street East Auckland 1143 / NZ | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKER, Bridget Lee 3/24A Grange Road Mt Eden Auckland 1024 / NZ | 02 /
HONG, Jiwon 2D/23 Emily Place Auckland Central Auckland / NZ | 03 /
HUDSON, Keith 10 Tanekaha Road Titirangi Auckland 0604 / NZ | 04 /
JAYASINGHE, Shakeela Nathalia 86B Aviemore Drive Highland Park Manukau City Auckland 2010 / NZ | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Docherty, Robert Charles, et al Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited Apollo House Eboracum Way Heworth Green, York YO31 7RE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12822836.8 | 08.08.2012 | WO2012NZ00140 | Priority number, date | US201161522609P | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161522609 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013022354 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2741823 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61P15/08, A61K35/52, A61K38/17, A61K47/48 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A61K38/063 (EP,US);
C12N5/061 (US);
A01N1/0221 (US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61K47/543 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
C07K14/70596 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SAMENFUNKTIONALITÄT | [2014/25] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING SPERM FUNCTIONALITY | [2014/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DESTINÉS À AMÉLIORER LA FONCTIONNALITÉ DU SPERME | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.07.2016 | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/46] | 07.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 21.07.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LEE R J ET AL, "DELIVERY OF LIPOSOMES INTO CULTURED KB CELLS VIA FOLATE RECEPTOR-MEDIATED ENDOCYTOSIS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, BETHESDA, MD, USA, (19940204), vol. 269, no. 5, ISSN 1083-351X, pages 3198 - 3204, XP009059971 [X] 1,4,5,10 * the whole document * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]WO2011099872 (ANDROGENIX LTD [NZ], et al); | [Y] - MOURA, A.A ET AL., "Proteins of the Accessory Sex Glands Associated With the Oocyte-Penetrating Capacity of Cauda Epididymal Sperm From Holstein Bulls of Documented Fertility.", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, (2007), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 214 - 222, XP055070994 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrd.20590 |