|
06.03.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.06.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2015 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Published international application - A4 |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notification of withdrawal of international application or designations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notification of withdrawal of international application or designations |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notification of withdrawal of international application or designations |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Invitation to submit amendments (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
14 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |