12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
04.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
09.02.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.02.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.11.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.11.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
21.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
03.07.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
24.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
08.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
26.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
09.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|