EP2890526 - A POSITIONER WITH ANGULAR WINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gok, Gokhan Vargin Gebze Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Teknopark Kemal Nehrezoglu Cad. Uretim 3 Gebze 41400 Kocaeli / TR | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Dereligil, Ersin, et al Destek Patent, Inc. Konak Mah. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Blok No: 36/5 16110 Besevler Nilufer Bursa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Iskender, Ibrahim Destek Patent, Inc. Konak Mah. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Block No: 36/5 Besevler Nilüfer 16110 Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 12823169.3 | 29.08.2012 | WO2012TR00135 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014035352 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890526 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B25J9/0096 (EP);
B23K37/0408 (EP);
B23K37/0435 (EP);
B23K37/047 (EP);
B23Q1/4804 (EP);
B23Q3/06 (EP);
B23K2101/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | STELLANTRIEB MIT ANGEWINKELTEN FLÜGELN | [2015/28] | English: | A POSITIONER WITH ANGULAR WINGS | [2015/28] | French: | POSITIONNEUR À AILES ANGULAIRES | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4666363 (JOHANSSON JOHN I E [SE]) [A] 1-8 * pages 1,2 *; | [A]FR2850046 (SAUVAGEAU COMMERCY SOUDURE [FR]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]WO2010069377 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]US2011084052 (LARKINS THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * |