EP2746691 - INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/26] | INDOOR AIR-CONDITIONER | ||
[2022/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai No.6 Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANG, Bin Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
GU, Tangtang Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2022/30] |
Former [2014/26] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12823323.6 | 13.08.2012 | [2022/30] | WO2012CN80050 | Priority number, date | CN201110234136 | 16.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110234136 | [2014/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013023568 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746691 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746691 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, F24F1/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP,US);
F24F13/10 (CN);
F24F7/04 (US);
F24F13/1406 (EP,US);
F24F2013/1433 (EP,US);
F24F2013/1446 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | F24F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENEINHEIT DER KLIMAANLAGE | [2022/17] | English: | INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER | [2022/17] | French: | UNITE INTERIEURE DU CLIMATISEUR | [2022/17] |
Former [2014/26] | INNENRAUMKLIMAANLAGE | ||
Former [2014/26] | INDOOR AIR-CONDITIONER | ||
Former [2014/26] | CLIMATISEUR INTÉRIEUR | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2014 | Translation filed | 21.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2012 | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | CY | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | DK | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | MK | 27.07.2022 | MT | 27.07.2022 | NL | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SI | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | IE | 13.08.2022 | LU | 13.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | FR | 27.09.2022 | GB | 27.10.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 13.08.2012 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 13.08.2012 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
MK | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 13.08.2012 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.08.2012 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 27.09.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 27.07.2022 | |
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 27.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2031320 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-11 *; | [XI]JP2011012926 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-3,12,14,15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0077]; figures 8-10 * [I] 4-11,13 | International search | [A]JPH08247491 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JP2002031400 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]CN201155825Y (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO [CN]); | [A]CN201246855Y (GUANGDONG MIDEA ELECTRIC APLNC [CN]); | [Y]WO2011007520 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2011012926 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]WO2011016171 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]CN202254165U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN202254164U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN202254159U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO) | Examination | EP2031320 |