EP2733778 - JELLY-ROLL WITH IMPROVED PROCESSABILITY AND BATTERY CELL INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Jiyoung LG Chem Research Park 188,Munji .ro , Yuseong - gu Daejon 305 - 380 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ki Gon LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji - ro , Yuseong -gu Daejon 305 -380 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Dae Hyun LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji - ro , Yuseong - gu Daejon 305 -380 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Junbo LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro ,Yuseong -gu Daejon 305-380 / KR | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2014/21] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12823813.6 | 31.07.2012 | [2016/32] | WO2012KR06076 | Priority number, date | KR20110080477 | 12.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110080477 | [2014/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013024984 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2733778 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2733778 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M2/02, H01M10/0587 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H01M10/0587 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K20/10 (KR,US);
H01M10/0431 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR,US);
H01M50/103 (KR);
H01M50/107 (KR);
H01M50/533 (KR);
H01M50/534 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/538 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K2101/38 (KR);
H01M2220/10 (KR);
H01M2220/20 (KR);
H01M2220/30 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | JELLY-ROLL MIT VERBESSERTER VERARBEITBARKEIT UND BATTERIEZELLE DAMIT | [2014/21] | English: | JELLY-ROLL WITH IMPROVED PROCESSABILITY AND BATTERY CELL INCLUDING SAME | [2014/21] | French: | ROULÉ DE GELÉE PRÉSENTANT UNE APTITUDE AU TRAITEMENT AMÉLIORÉE ET CELLULE DE BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2014 | Translation filed | 12.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 05.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2012 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01232667 (FUJI ELECTROCHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 9 * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US6117589 (SATOU KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10-12 * figures 1-2c,10 * * column 2, line 46 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, line 10 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 17 - column 4, line 40 * * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 49 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 3 * [A] 9; | [A]US2006040179 (BANG SUN-HEE [KR]) [A] 9* figures 3b, 9b * | International search | [X]JP2005149921 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al); | [A]KR100670502B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.); | [A]KR100709872B (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR100889767B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) |